Makransky v. Doto et al
Plaintiff: John Makransky
Defendant: David Doto and Jenna Wells-Doto
Case Number: 2:2016cv00563
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulated Request to Suspend Litigation Pending the Filing of a Stipulation for Dismissal of All Claims. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by 3/15/17, the parties must filed a stipulated dismissal or submit to the court a joint status report outlining what issues are impeding settlement, and what assistance the court may provide. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/16/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Denying 39 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that 18 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff John Makransky's Amended Complaint is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff John Makransky's Original Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of this order to respond to 50 defendant's motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall have seven (7) days from the date the response is filed to submit a reply Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Denying 38 Defendant Jenna Wells-Doto's Emergency Motion to Stay Enforcement of the Magistrate Judge's Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff John Makransky's request for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation for Payment re: 34 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Makransky v. Doto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Doto
Represented By: Eric D. Hone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenna Wells-Doto
Represented By: Eric D. Hone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Makransky
Represented By: V. R. Bohman
Represented By: Patrick Gerard Byrne
Represented By: Michael D Fishbein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?