Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P. v. Nebel et al
Plaintiff: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P.
Defendant: Mikayla Nebel and Russel Niggemyer
Counter Claimant: Mikayla Nebel
Unknown: Greer Novalis Shaw and Marjorie Witter Norman
Counter Defendant: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00592
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 130 DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P. against Russel Niggemyer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER denying as moot 100 Report and Recommendation; ORDER granting 127 Motion for Attorney Fees; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER and JUDGMENT Adopting 124 Proposed Judgment (See Order for Details). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, should plaintiff seek attorneys' fees, it shall submit a corresponding motion requesting that relief within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified on 6/15/2017 (JM).
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 101 Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff shall prepare and file an appropriate judgment, which will close the case, for the court's signature within seven (7) days of this court's order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER Granting 108 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kyle G. Kunst and approving Designation of Local Counsel Steven A. Caloiaro for Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, LP. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Patrick William Kelly withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 09/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation re 60 Counterclaim. Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P. answer due 5/6/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P. v. Nebel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Mikayla Nebel
Represented By: Patrick William Kelly
Represented By: Michael Paretti
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Greer Novalis Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Marjorie Witter Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mikayla Nebel
Represented By: Patrick William Kelly
Represented By: Michael Paretti
Represented By: Michael D Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russel Niggemyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P.
Represented By: Kyle George Kunst
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Security Alarm Financing Enterprises, L.P.
Represented By: Kyle George Kunst
Represented By: Robert Lee Sallander, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?