Bank of America, N.A. v. Giavanna Homeowners Association, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, Bella Legato PBB Trust and Giavanna Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00612
Filed: March 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Bank of America, N.A. against Bella Legato PBB Trust. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Default Judgment; plaintiff shall prepare and file an appropriate judgment for the court's signature consistent with the foregoing within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting 71 Stipulation of Dismissal without prejudice as to Giavanna HOA and Absolute Collection Services; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying 56 Motion for Default Judgment.; granting 24 Motion for Summary Judgment.; denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Motion to Remove Attorney Miles N. Clark from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 03/06/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Giavanna Homeowners Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bella Legato PBB Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giavanna Homeowners Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Represented By: Richard E. Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?