Budd v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Glenford Budd
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Renee Baker
Case Number: 2:2016cv00613
Filed: March 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion to Dismiss; Case is stayed until further order of this court. IT FURTHER IS ORDERED that the clerk of court shall administratively close this action until such time as the court grants a motion to reopen the action. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/14/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 59 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time (First Request) is GRANTED. Petitioner will have up to and including 5/1/2020, to file and serve a response to Respondents' 54 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time. Second Amended Petition due by 1/22/2020. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner will have up to and including 12/23/19, to file a Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Motion to Extend Time. Second Amended Petition due by 9/24/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Petition. Second Amended Petition due by 9/3/2019 (see Order for additional deadlines). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that petitioner will have ninety (90) days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve a motion or notice indicating how petitioner wishes to proceed with this action. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 36 petitioner's counsel's motion to withdraw is GRANTED, and Ms. Wilson is terminated as counsel of record for petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents' time to respond to 23 the first amended petition is continued without date pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Plaintiff, CJA Coordinator - ADR)
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that ground XII of the amended petition is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents will have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to answer or otherwise respond to 23 the amended petition. See Order for further deadlines. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 6/23/2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Extend Time. Petitioner will have through 5/23/18, to file and serve an amended petition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 17 petitioner's motion for extension of time (second request) is GRANTED. Petitioner will have through 4/23/2018, to file and serve an amended petition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 15 petitioner's motion for extension of time (first request) is GRANTED. Petitioner will have through 2/5/18, to file and serve an amended petition. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Mary Lou Wilson, 2064 Regent St., Reno, NV 89509, is appointed as counsel for petitioner for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have sixty (60) days from the date on which this order is entered to file an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 11 the motion to withdraw is GRANTED. The representation of petitioner by Angela H. Dows is TERMINATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the court shall forward a copy of this order to the CJA Coordinator, who shall locate substitute counsel for petitioner. The clerk of the court also shall send a copy of this order to petitioner himself, Glenford Budd, #90043, Ely State Prison, P.O. Box 1989, Ely, NV 89301. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: CJA Coordinator, Petitioner - ADR)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 1 the application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 2 petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender is provisionally a ppointed to represent petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Federal Public Defender shall have thirty (30) days from the date that this order is entered to undertake direct representation of petitioner or to indicate to the court his inab ility to represent petitioner in these proceedings. If the Federal Public Defender doesundertake representation of petitioner, he shall then have sixty (60) days to file an amended petition for a writ of habeas corpus. If the Federal Public Defender is unable to represent petitioner, then the court shall appoint alternate counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General for the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall electronically serve both the Attorney General of the State of Nevada and the Federal Public Defender a copy of 5 the petition and a copy of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 3 the request for evidentiary hearing is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Budd v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Glenford Budd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?