Bolding et al v. NAV-LVH Casino, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Charles Bolding, Donna Ehlert, Wayne Harris, Melvin Shipman and Toni Varay
Defendant: NAV-LVH Casino, LLC, Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC and Westgate Resort, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00617
Filed: March 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting 81 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 79 Stipulation to Vacate Trial and Pending Deadlines; Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/21/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting 63 Stipulation; Discovery due by 7/21/2018. Motions due by 8/25/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting 61 Stipulation; Discovery due by 6/6/2018. Motions due by 7/11/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER that Plaintiff may file a supplemental brief in support of his 51 motion to substitute no later than August 24, 2017. Defendant may file a supplement within seven days of Plaintiff's supplement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting and Adopting 31 Report and Recommendation and Granting 27 Motion to Sever. Plaintiff Shipman's case is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bolding et al v. NAV-LVH Casino, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bolding
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Ehlert
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Harris
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin Shipman
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Toni Varay
Represented By: Michael P. Balaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAV-LVH Casino, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Myrna L. Maysonet
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Las Vegas Resort, LLC
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Myrna L. Maysonet
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westgate Resort, Inc.
Represented By: Richard W. Epstein
Represented By: Myrna L. Maysonet
Represented By: Phillip A. Silvestri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?