Tuuamalemalo v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Ian Tuuamalemalo
Defendant: Officer S. Green, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Officer S. MPhillips
Case Number: 2:2016cv00619
Filed: March 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER that an in chambers telephonic hearing regarding the settlement conference is scheduled for 11:00 AM on 5/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Denying Defendants' 20 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Rebuttal Expert Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 4/28/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's Responses due by 4/21/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tuuamalemalo v. Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer S. Green
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer S. MPhillips
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Tuuamalemalo
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Represented By: Potter Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?