Bank of America, N.A., , v. Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: |
Bank of America, N.A. |
Defendant: |
Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association, Thomas Jessup, LLC and Thomas Jessup, LLC, Series IV |
Cross Defendant: |
Alessi & Koenig, LLC and Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association |
Counter Defendant: |
Bank of America, N.A. |
Counter Claimant: |
Thomas Jessup, LLC and Thomas Jessup, LLC, Series IV |
Cross Claimant: |
Thomas Jessup, LLC and Thomas Jessup, LLC, Series IV |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00650 |
Filed: |
March 24, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Mahan |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Foreclosure |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 24, 2019 |
Filing
60
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 36 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Arlington's motion or summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
March 22, 2017 |
Filing
47
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 36 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 the HOA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED consistent with the foregoing. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
January 26, 2017 |
Filing
45
ORDER that the HOA's 21 Motion to Dismiss the 1 Complaint is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that the HOA's 27 Motion to Dismiss the 11 Cross-Claim is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
August 4, 2016 |
Filing
34
ORDER Granting 33 Ex Parte Motion. Attorney Hyungseon S. Jeong terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
May 9, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER Granting 15 Stipulation re 11 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim. Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association answer due 6/6/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AR)
|
April 20, 2016 |
Filing
13
ORDER Granting 10 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association answer due 5/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A., , v. Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross defendant: Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association |
Represented By: |
J. William Ebert |
Represented By: |
Joseph P Garin |
Represented By: |
Hyungseon S. Jeong |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Arlington West Twilight Homeowners Association |
Represented By: |
J. William Ebert |
Represented By: |
Joseph P Garin |
Represented By: |
Hyungseon S. Jeong |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Thomas Jessup, LLC |
Represented By: |
Richard L Tobler |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Thomas Jessup, LLC, Series IV |
Represented By: |
Richard L Tobler |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter defendant: Bank of America, N.A. |
Represented By: |
Melanie D Morgan |
Represented By: |
Allison R. Schmidt |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A. |
Represented By: |
Melanie D Morgan |
Represented By: |
Allison R. Schmidt |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter claimant: Thomas Jessup, LLC |
Represented By: |
Richard L Tobler |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Counter claimant: Thomas Jessup, LLC, Series IV |
Represented By: |
Richard L Tobler |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross claimant: Thomas Jessup, LLC |
Represented By: |
Richard L Tobler |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Cross claimant: Thomas Jessup, LLC, Series IV |
Represented By: |
Richard L Tobler |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?