Rowe v. Clark County School District et al
Plaintiff: Michael Rowe
Defendant: Clark County Education Association, Clark County School District, Clark County School District Police Department and Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Case Number: 2:2016cv00661
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER that 142 Motion to Submit Original Charging Documents is DENIED as moot. The clerk shall strike the motion and attached exhibit from the record. Further frivolous filings by plaintiff in this case will result in sanctions. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER that 139 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER that 124 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 83 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting 129 Ex Parte Motion to Remove Counsel from CM/ECF Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER that 113 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 76 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant CCSD may file, within fourteen (14) days, a renewed motion for summary judgment in accordance with the court's April 28, 2017, order (ECF No. 110 ). FURTHER ORDERED that 77 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 117 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is STRICKEN. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER that 104 and 105 Defendants' Motions to Strike are GRANTED. The Clerk shall STRIKE 102 Plaintiff Michael Rowe's Amended Motion to Compel a Dismissal Hearing and 103] Letter to Your Honor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 6/26/2017 to link to correct motions (MMM).
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER that 30 plaintiff's Motion to Amend the complaint is DENIED; 17 CCEA's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED, without prejudice; 19 CCSD and CCSDPD's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, without prejudice; CCSDP D is dismissed from the case. FURTHER ORDERED that, if plaintiff wishes to submit a renewed motion to amend his complaint, he must do so within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. Any proposed amended complaint must comply with Local Rule 15-1, and the motion must comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Granting 80 Motion to Strike 73 Motion to Vacate; Granting 87 Motion to Strike 82 Letter; and Granting 93 Motion to Strike 91 Letter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 71 Motion to Remove Attorneys Craig R. Anderson and Brianna Smith from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Denying Defendant LVMPD's 52 Motion to Compel Plaintiff to Unseal Criminal Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR) Modified on 11/22/2016 to correct text (TR).
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that 31 Plaintiff's Countermotion to Stay Proceedings against Defendant Clark County Education Association is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. Clark County School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Education Association
Represented By: Thomas J Donaldson
Represented By: Casey A. Gillham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Adam D Honey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District Police Department
Represented By: S. Scott Greenberg
Represented By: Adam D Honey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Craig R. Anderson
Represented By: Brianna Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Rowe
Represented By: Alexis L. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?