The State of Nevada v. United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
Plaintiff: The State of Nevada
Defendant: Michael Alexander, John W. Boyer, City of Las Vegas, Clark County, Davidson Investments Limited Partnership, Eaglemark Savings Bank, Darrell E. Jackson, L.S. Enterprises, Inc., Andrew S. Levy, Nevada Title Company, State of Nevada, Department of Eomplyment, Training & Rehabilitation, Thomas M. Strawn, Jr. and United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 2:2016cv00665
Filed: March 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 139 the defendants' Motion to Remand is GRANTED. The case is remanded to the state court from which it was removed for all further proceedings. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Certified Copy of Order and Docket Sheet sent to State Court - MR)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting 141 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 131 Order (First Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/17/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Granting 133 Stipulation re 124 Notice Permission to Appeal. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Regarding 124 Petition to Appeal. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER Granting 128 Stipulation re 124 Notice Permission to Appeal and 120 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 124 Defendants Darrell E Jackson, Thomas M. Strawn, and Andrew S. Levy's petition for permission to appeal shall be heard at the previously scheduled hearing on Wednesday, 10/11/2017 on a stacked calendar beginning a t 9:00 a.m. in the Thomas & Mack Moot Court Room at UNLV's Boyd School of Law. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any response shall be filed by 10/6/2017. No replies. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 120 the parties' stipulation to set oral argument is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 69 , 107 plaintiff State of Nevada's motions for summary judgment regarding lost rents and holding costs are GRANTED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 105 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Tio DiFederico's Supplemental Report (Second) Regarding the Temporary Construction Easement is DENIED, without prejudice to filing a motion in limine to exclude Mr. DiFederico's supplemental report on the grounds that it is not a valid expert opinion. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 75 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw Funds on Deposit is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall prepare a check for the $167,000.00 in funds on deposit, along with any interes t accrued on said funds since their deposit, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order with the check made payable to "American Commonwealth Mortgage". Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance - MR)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Strike Supplemental Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulation Requesting Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation Regarding The City of Las Vegas' Conditional Disclaimer of Interest. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ERROR: Docketed in error by Clerk's Office. CORRECTION: Document terminated. DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Motion For Change Of Attorney Designation. Attorney Scott R. Davis terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
May 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED counsel for the parties shall file a Joint Status Report which fully complies with the Minutes of the Court no later than May 20, 2016. Failure to comply may result in the issuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 05/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Occupancy. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING HEARING. Plaintiff State of Nevada' s 1 -3 Motion for Order for Immediate Occupancy Pending Entry of Judgment is set for 3/29/2016 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 6C before Judge Andrew P. Gordon. The parties and counsel may appear te lephonically by calling the Court conference line at 877-336-1831 at least five minutes prior to the hearing. The conference code is 6948860. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The State of Nevada v. United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson Investments Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaglemark Savings Bank
Represented By: Robert E Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell E. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.S. Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew S. Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Title Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada, Department of Eomplyment, Training & Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas M. Strawn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Mark E. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Nevada
Represented By: Scott R. Davis
Represented By: Dennis V. Gallagher
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Represented By: Joseph X. Vadala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?