Bank of America, N.A. v. The Willows Homeowners' Association, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC, SFR Investments Pool I, LLC and Willows Homeowners' Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00678
Filed: March 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER to Release Bond. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Re: 91 Status Report. IT IS ORDERED that litigation will remain stayed until March 1, 2021. The parties shall file a stipulation or status report on or before March 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. IT IS ORDERED that litigation is stayed until 11/30/2020. The parties shall file a stipulation or status report on or before 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this all claims in this case are dismissed and the clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Shane D. Cox from the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Absolute Collection Services, LLC shall have until 1/21/20 to advise the Court if it will retain new counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add the last known address of Defendants to the civil docket and send a copy of this Order to Defendants' last known address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Absolute Collection Services, LLC - ADR)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 47 plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.'s motion to lift stay is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 51 defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's motion to lift stay is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Remove Miles N. Clark, Esq., from the electronic service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying 30 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs and Granting 32 Motion to Strike 30 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Directing Parties to Certify Cases to Nevada Attorney General. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the party challenging Chapter 116's constitutionality in each of these cases must serve the Nevada Attorney General with the complaint, motion, or other filing that calls into question Chapter 116's constitutionality, and shall file proof of compliance within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/18/16.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. The Willows Homeowners' Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Absolute Collection Services, LLC
Represented By: Shane D. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool I, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willows Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?