Bank of America, N.A. v. The Willows Homeowners' Association, et al
Plaintiff: |
Bank of America, N.A. |
Defendant: |
Absolute Collection Services, LLC, SFR Investments Pool I, LLC and Willows Homeowners' Association |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv00678 |
Filed: |
March 29, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Real Property: Other |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 12, 2021 |
Filing
97
ORDER to Release Bond. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
December 1, 2020 |
Filing
92
ORDER Re: 91 Status Report. IT IS ORDERED that litigation will remain stayed until March 1, 2021. The parties shall file a stipulation or status report on or before March 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
August 28, 2020 |
Filing
90
ORDER granting 89 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. IT IS ORDERED that litigation is stayed until 11/30/2020. The parties shall file a stipulation or status report on or before 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
|
June 22, 2020 |
Filing
83
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this all claims in this case are dismissed and the clerk of court is instructed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
December 19, 2019 |
Filing
76
ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Withdraw Attorney Shane D. Cox from the case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Absolute Collection Services, LLC shall have until 1/21/20 to advise the Court if it will retain new counsel. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall add the last known address of Defendants to the civil docket and send a copy of this Order to Defendants' last known address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Absolute Collection Services, LLC - ADR)
|
August 22, 2019 |
Filing
65
ORDER Granting 64 Motion to Lift Stay of Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 12, 2017 |
Filing
57
ORDER. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that 47 plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.'s motion to lift stay is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 51 defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's motion to lift stay is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
December 22, 2016 |
Filing
49
ORDER Granting 48 Motion to Remove Miles N. Clark, Esq., from the electronic service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
|
August 19, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER TEMPORARILY STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
August 3, 2016 |
Filing
42
ORDER Denying 30 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs and Granting 32 Motion to Strike 30 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
April 18, 2016 |
Filing
9
ORDER Directing Parties to Certify Cases to Nevada Attorney General. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the party challenging Chapter 116's constitutionality in each of these cases must serve the Nevada Attorney General with the complaint, motion, or other filing that calls into question Chapter 116's constitutionality, and shall file proof of compliance within 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/18/16.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?