Bank of America, N.A. v. Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre Homeowners' Association, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre Homeowners' Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00699
Filed: March 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. SFR's 70 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted in part and Denied in part. The HOA's 71 Motion for Summary Judgment is Denied as moot and SFR's 109 Motion to Strike is Denied. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER Re: 102 Response to Order to Show Cause. Stipulation to Dismiss deadline: 12/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 60 First Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline Pending Ruling on 59 Motion for Protective Order. The dispositive motions deadline is extended until 75 days from the date the Court enters an order on BANA's 59 motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Jason Joseph Zummo terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 46 Motion to Remove Attorney Allison R. Schmidt from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, No. 15-15233 (9th Cir.). All pending motions are Denied without prejudice with leave to refile within 21 days afte r the stay is lifted. Beginning on 3/23/2017 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every 180 days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Granting 41 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw Attorney H. Sunny Jeong and Remove Counsel from Service List. The Clerk of the Court shall unseal each of the Ex Parte Motions and make them available on the court's public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 21 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 18 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. Plaintiff's Responses due by 7/15/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre Homeowners' Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travata and Montage at Summerlin Centre Homeowners' Association
Represented By: Joseph P Garin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?