May 2, 2019 |
Filing
110
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED THAT the clerk of court close this matter, as all pending claims for relief have been resolved. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
August 1, 2017 |
Filing
98
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the instant 59 stipulation be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
July 6, 2017 |
Filing
95
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 41 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 79 SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED.< br>IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 69 SFR's motion for partial summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 SFR's motion to certify a question of law to Nevada's Supreme Court be, and the same h ereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 BANA's claims for breach of NRS 116.1113 and wrongful foreclosure against the HOA and Alessi be, and the same hereby are, DISMISSED as unexhausted, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1 BANA's claim for injunctive relief against SFR be, and the same hereby is, DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
April 18, 2017 |
Filing
88
ORDER Granting 87 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 41 , 79 Motions for Summary Judgment and 80 Joinder (First Request). Replies due by 5/2/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
March 28, 2017 |
Filing
84
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 78 the second joint motion to extend time be, and the same hereby is, DENIED, without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 83 the first stipulation for extension of time be, and the same hereby is, DENIED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
March 24, 2017 |
Filing
82
ORDER Denying 81 Stipulation to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/24/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
February 17, 2017 |
Filing
77
ORDER. The parties' stipulation to stay 75 is hereby DENIED without prejudice. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
|
January 13, 2017 |
Filing
73
ORDER Granting 46 Motion for Protective Order. SFR may only inquire about the topics listed supra at 4:8-4:15. Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) designee shall appear for the deposition in Dallas, Texas by videoconference. Plaintiff's counsel may choose to participate from either Las Vegas or Dallas. Plaintiff's motion for sanctions, 47 , is hereby DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
January 12, 2017 |
Filing
72
ORDER Denying 42 Joint Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing
66
ORDER re 46 Emergency Motion for Protective Order. No later than 12/12/2016 Defendant SFR may file a sur-reply addressing only the arguments raised by Plaintiff in its reply regarding the denial of the Bourne Valley petition for rehearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
November 17, 2016 |
Filing
64
ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuits decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the e xtent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing
57
ORDER. On November 4, 2016, the Ninth Circuit denied counsel for Bourne Valley's petition for rehearing or rehearing en banc. See Case No. 15-15233, D.C. No. 2:13-cv-00649-JCM-GWF. The Court therefore ORDERS the parties to submit supplemental briefing discussing whether this recent development moots the pending motion to stay, no later than November 16, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 25, 2016 |
Filing
54
ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation To Extend Time To file Response To Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
October 19, 2016 |
Filing
50
ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation To Extend Time to File Response to Motion For Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
October 3, 2016 |
Filing
43
ORDER RE 42 Defendant's Joint Emergency Motion to Stay Briefing and/or Litigation. A response to this motion must be filed no later than October 5, 2016. Any reply must be filed no later than October 7, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on 10/3/2016 to correct text - (DL).
|
August 30, 2016 |
Filing
40
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 34 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and striking 36 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
July 19, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER Denying Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 25 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Demand for Security Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 07/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
|
April 27, 2016 |
Filing
9
ORDER Granting 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Bank of America, N.A. shall post a cost bond in the amount of $500.00 or make a cash deposit of $500.00 as to SFR Investment Pool 1, LLC within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|