Rossignoli v. Realtime Resolutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alejandra I. Rossignoli
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Realtime Resolutions, Inc., Seneca Mortgage Servicing and TD Bank USA/Target Credit
Case Number: 2:2016cv00754
Filed: April 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 03/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with prejudice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Motion to Remove Attorney Sean N. Payne from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 02/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER Denying 15 Motion to Dismiss as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending dates, deadlines, and filing requirements as to defendant Seneca Mortgage Service LLC are vacated. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulation to dismiss on or before 3/20/17. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 09/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Joint Motion Dismissing Action Without Prejudice as to Defendant TD Bank USA/Target Credit. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 07/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 16 and 21 Verified Petitions for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Elizabeth A. Sperling and approving Attorney Gregory S. Gilbert as Designation of Local Counsel for Defendant Seneca Mortgage Servicing. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rossignoli v. Realtime Resolutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Realtime Resolutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seneca Mortgage Servicing
Represented By: Sean D. Thueson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank USA/Target Credit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandra I. Rossignoli
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?