Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc. and Lee Family Properties, LLC
Counter Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc. and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Counter Claimant: Lee Family Properties, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00763
Filed: April 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 35 the motion to lift stay is GRANTED IN PART in that THE STAY IS LIFTED, but some of the other details and deadlines requested by the motion are denied or revised. Any party that has been served with the operative comp laint but has not yet answered it (and who is not the beneficiary of a bankruptcy automatic stay) has until 5/24/19, to answer or otherwise respond to the operative complaint. Amended Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/28/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting 30 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Miles N Clark terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying without prejudice 25 Motion to Lift Stay to the filing of a new motion after the Supreme Court rules on the Bourne Valley and Saticoy Bay petitions for certiorari review. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STAYING CASE Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank . Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Under 28 U.S.C. § 2403(b) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.1(b), I hereby certify to the Attorney General for the State of Nevada that the constitutionality of Chapter 116 has been called into question in these actions. The Attorney General for the State of Nevada has 60 days to intervene in these actions if it so desires. FRCP 5.1(c). Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc NV AG, Carson City/Las Vegas - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company v. Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Family Properties, LLC
Represented By: David S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Lee Family Properties, LLC
Represented By: David S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?