Maldonado v. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Raymond Maldonado
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00784
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER. Based on 44 the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED in its entirety, each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that 16 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Materials. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying Defendant HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.'s 22 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 01/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) to Respond to 16 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Responses due by 12/5/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maldonado v. HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Mortgage Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Maldonado
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?