William J. Fineout v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: William J. Fineout
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Equifax Information Services LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00788
Filed: April 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 02/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation of Dismissal of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 01/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Remove Attorney Miles N. Clark from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER Granting 48 Stipulation of Dismissal as to JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation re 1 Complaint. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. answer due 7/13/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/10/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: William J. Fineout v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Fineout
Represented By: Michael Kind
Represented By: David H. Krieger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?