Bank of America, N.A. v. Falcon Pointe Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Falcon Pointe Association, Red Rock Financial Services, LLC and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00814
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER that the Clerk of Court is instructed to close the case and enter judgment in accordance with this Order and the Court's 136 Order on the parties' summary judgment motions. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER granting ECF No. 144 Motion to Remove Attorney James W. Pengilly from Electronic Service List for Falcon Point Homeowners Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER that Plaintiffs 110 Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. SFR's 117 Second Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. SFRs Motion is granted only with respect to its crossclaim for quiet title against Borrowers. Plaintiff and SFR's prior 65 and 68 Motions for Partial Summary Judgment are DENIED. SFR's 77 Motion for Relief is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting 124 First Stipulation for Extension of Time re Replies to 110 Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 117 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due 8/17/2018. Replies due by 8/17/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Granting 118 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 110 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 117 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses to 110 due by 7/20/2018. Responses to 117 due by 7/24/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Granting 100 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Jesse A. Ransom terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER Granting 97 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 93 Motion for Protective Order. BANA's Replies due by 2/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that Plaintiff Bank of America, N.A.'s 66 Motion to Stay Discovery and Remaining Case Deadlines Pending Resolution of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's 70 and 71 Counter Motions to allow the case to proceed without restriction, or in the alternative, for a complete stay of litigation are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Granting 73 and 74 Stipulations for Extension of Time (First Request) re 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and 66 Motion to Stay Case. Responses to 65 due by 12/6/2017. Replies to 66 due by 12/6/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 62 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, No. 15-15233. Once exhaustion occurs any party may move to lift the stay. All pending motions are Denied without pr ejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted. Beginning 3/21/2017 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every one-hundred and eighty days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Serve Melanie Giese by Publication and Granting 51 Motion to Enlarge Time to Serve Summons and Cross-Claim. Service is extended by an additional 60 days from the date of this order is entered to allow SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC to effectuate service by publication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 41 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Donna M. Wittig removed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Falcon Pointe Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Donna M. Wittig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Falcon Pointe Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: David R Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?