Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Montagne Marron Community Association and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00847
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Granting 115 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. IT IS SO ORDERED that Attorneys Jason G. Martinez and Karen L. Hanks are removed from the service list. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/17/2021 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - YAW)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 85 Plaintiff BNYM's Motion for Partial Summary is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 84 Defendant HOA's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 86 Defendant SFR's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is hereby instructed to close the case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/25/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 67 Motion for Default Judgment; DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC against John Edward Bostaph, Jr. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED ORDER Re: 59 Order. Parties shall have thirty days from the date of remand to file renewed dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/26/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: USCA - JM)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER that the Court's prior Order, (ECF No. 54 ), is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have thirty days from the date of this Order to file renewed dispositive motions. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/18/2019., Case reopened. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified on 12/19/2019 (EDS).
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 41 Motion to Strike.Plaintiff's remaining claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because SFR's counterclaims and cross-claims are directly opposite of Plaintiffs, SFRs counterclaims and cross-claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 51 Stipulation to Extend Dispositive Motions Deadline Pending Ruling on Motion for Protective Order; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 50 Stipulation Re Second Amended Notice of Rule 30(b)(6); Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) Re: 36 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 12/13/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Case stayed pending appeals. Joint Status Report due by 4/25/2017. All pending motions Denied without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon v. SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Montagne Marron Community Association
Represented By: Edward D Boyack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?