Bank of America, N.A. v. Sonrisa Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Sonrisa Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00848
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 DEFAULT JUDGMENT Granting 145 Motion for Default Judgment in favor of SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC against Jennifer L Watkins, Rick C Watkins. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 132 BANA's motion for reconsideration be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 136 BANA's motion to file supplemental authorities be, and the same h ereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 137 BANA's amended motion to file supplemental authorities be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 129 the court order filed on 7/17/17 and the same hereby is, VACATED. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 115 BANA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 116 the HOA's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANT ED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 117 the SFR's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. The clerk is instructed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 114 the parties' notice of corrected image/document regarding the refiled stipulation to amend complaint to reassert a breach of NRS 116.3116 and wrongful foreclosure claims be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 104 the parties' first stipulation to amend complaint to reassert a breach of NRS 116.3116 and wrongful foreclosure claims be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED th at 109 the parties' refiled stipulation to amend complaint to reassert a breach of NRS 116.3116 and wrongful foreclosure claims be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 105 the parties first stipulation and order for amended joint discovery plan be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 107 the parties' first stipulation and order for amended joint discovery plan be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Granting 123 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 115 , 116 , 117 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/31/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER Granting 120 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 115 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/17/2018. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting 103 Stipulation to Lift Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting 100 Stipulation to Extend Time. (Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/11/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 9/12/2017 to reflect correct due date (ADR).
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 9/12/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER that 58 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED as moot; 85 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED; and 87 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 7 the HOA's motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART consistent with the foregoing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 72 SFR's motion to ce rtify be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 92 SFR's motion to stay be, and the same hereby is, DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 90 the parties stipulation (second request) be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Granting 86 Stipulation Regarding Stay of Litigation and Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Main Document 93 replaced on 2/3/2017) (MR).
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 43 defendant/counterplaintiff SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's motion to reconsider be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 42 SFR's motion to strike be, an d the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 31 BANA's motion for demand for security costs be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 SFR's motion to reconsider be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 50 SFR's reply be, and the same hereby is, STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 78 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Motion for Summary Judgment. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 59 Defendant SFR's Emergency Motion to Stay is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 62 Plaintiff BANA's Emergency Motion for a ProtectiveOrder from its 30(b)(6) Deposition and Motion for Sanctions is granted in part and denied in part. Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order from its 30(b)(6) Deposition is granted on a limited basis as detailed above. Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulation and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 11/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting 60 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Attorney Miles N Clark terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying Defendant's 30 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 07/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than July 18, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 11 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Nevada Association Services, Inc. to File a Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (First Request). Nevada Association Services, Inc. answer due 6/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Sonrisa Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V. Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonrisa Homeowners Association
Represented By: Sean L. Anderson
Represented By: Ryan D Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?