US Bank National Association v. BDJ Intestments, LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Defendant: BDJ Investments, LLC and Lone Mountain Quartette Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00866
Filed: April 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER Granting 114 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 99 Motion for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 6/18/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER that 82 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED and 85 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint consistent with the foregoing discussion within fourteen (14) days of this Order's iss uance. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file Motions for Summary Judgment within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of Plaintiff's second amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 92 Stipulation re: 85 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 1/10/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting 89 Stipulation e: 85 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 1/9/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Granting 57 Motion to Dismiss, Denying as Moot 68 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying 70 Motion to Stay Case. Amended Complaint due within 14 days of the filing of this order, should Plaintiff elect to file one. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 50 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Dana Jonathon Nitz and Kristin A. OQuinn are substituted in place of Thomas Beckom and Kristin A Schuler-Hintz for plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REVISED ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Adam H. Clarkson and Matthew J. McAlonis substituted in place of Robert S. Larsen for defendant Lone Mountain Quartette Community Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Adam H Clarkson and Matthew J. McAlonis substituted in place of Robert S. Larsen for defendant Lone Mountain Quartette Community Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Margaret E Schmidt terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, No. 15-15233 (9th Cir. Aug. 12, 2016). Once exhaustion occurs, any party may move to lift the stay. Until that time, all proceedings in this action are stayed.FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within twenty-one days after the stay is lifted.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant BDJ Investments, LLC shall ca re for, preserve, and maintain the property located at 10625 Colter Bay Court, Las Vegas, NV 89129 ("Property").FURTHER ORDERED that, beginning on April 26, 2017, the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the st atus of this case every one- hundred and eighty days. Along with the joint status report, Defendant BDJ Investments, LLC shall submit a statement affirming that all expenses necessary to maintain the Property, including but not limited to, timely an d full payment of all homeowners association assessments, property taxes, and property insurance premiums due and owing or past due at any time during the effective period of this Stay, are current and up to date.FURTHER ORDERED that this Order d oes not prevent the parties from continuing to engage in settlement conference negotiations with the assistance of the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that 18 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff must submit a bond pursuant to this Order in the amount of $500.00 as to Defendant. Failure to do so within thirty days of the filing date of this Order shall constitute grounds for dismissal.FURTHER ORDERED that 25 Motion to Extend Time is DENIED as moot. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED the parties shall file their Certificate of Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1 no later than May 23, 2016. Failure to comply may result in theissuance of an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 05/09/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Bank National Association v. BDJ Intestments, LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BDJ Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lone Mountain Quartette Community Association
Represented By: David T. Gluth II
Represented By: Robert S. Larsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Bank National Association
Represented By: Thomas Beckom
Represented By: Kristin A Schuler-Hintz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?