Belval v. Walgreen's et al
Plaintiff: Marie Lynn Belval
Defendant: Desert Springs Hospital Medical Center, HealthCare Partners Medical Group, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, Robert Musni, Sedgwick Insurance, Sunrise Medical Center, Von's and Walgreen's
Case Number: 2:2016cv00893
Filed: April 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 42 Magistrate Judge Foley's report and recommendation be, and the same hereby is, ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against defendant Siegel Suites be, and the same hereby are, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case be, and the same hereby is, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 28 plaintiff's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER and REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have until 1/5/18 to file a second amended complaint if she believes she can corr ect the noted deficiencies. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 34 Motion for Relief is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 38 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 40 Motion for Defendant's Name Change is denied. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's claims against Siegel Suites be dismissed with prejudice for Plaintiffs failure to demonstrate that the Court has subject matter jurisdiction over her claims. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 12/7/2017 to correct document title. (ADR).
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 12 , 21 plaintiff's objections to the magistrate judge's order be, and the same hereby are, DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER that 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Complaint be dismissed without prejudice with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall have until February 21, 2017 to file an amend ed complaint if she believes she can correct the noted deficiencies. Failure to comply with this Order will result in the dismissal of this action.FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint (ECF Nos. 6 , 8 , 13 , and 20 ) are denied. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint she shall include all parties and claims against them at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's 2 , 4 , 5 , 7 , 14 , 15 , 17 , 18 , 19 , and 22 Motions are Denied without prejudice as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 09/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belval v. Walgreen's et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Lynn Belval
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desert Springs Hospital Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthCare Partners Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Musni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunrise Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Von's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?