U.S. Bank, National Association v. Sunridge Heights Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc., SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Sunridge Heights Homeowners Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv00899
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 73 Partial Motion for Summary Judgment. The HOA's 72 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted in part and Denied in part. SFR's 74 Motion for Summary Judgment is Granted in part and Denied part. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Granting 75 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 72 Motion for Summary Judgment, 73 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and 74 Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses to 72 due by 12/11/2018. Responses to 73 and 74 due by 12/14/2018. Replies due by 1/4/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 44 Motion to Partially Lift Stay of Case, 47 Counter Motion to Stay Case, and 48 Counter Motion to Allow Case to Proceed Without Restriction. Replies to 44 due by 12/12/2017. Responses to 47 and 48 due by 12/12/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting ECF No. 35 Motion to Lift Stay; granting ECF No. 36 Motion for Service by Publication; granting ECF No. 37 Motion to Extend Time to Serve Summons and Cross-Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, No. 15-15233 (9th Cir.). All pending motions are Denied without prejudice with leave to refile within 21 days aft er the stay is lifted. Beginning on 3/23/2017 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every 180 days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Remove Attorney Miles N. Clark from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 09/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank, National Association v. Sunridge Heights Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V. Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sunridge Heights Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank, National Association
Represented By: Miles Clark
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?