Robinson v. Dungarvin Nevada, LLC
Plaintiff: James E. Robinson
Defendant: Dungarvin Nevada, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00902
Filed: April 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER denying 53 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 55 Motion to Amend/Correct; ORDER granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER denying 48 Motion to Compel. Defendant shall have until July 21, 2017, to serve plaintiff with responses to his requests for production, and answers to interrogatories. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER striking 43 Motion for Monetary Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified on 5/1/2017 (JM).
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 31 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment for Charlotte McClanahan and Barbara Jordan and against Robinson on all claims against them. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 01/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that this case shall proceed on the normal litigation track as guided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 11/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Dungarvin Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dungarvin Nevada, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James E. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?