Salvador v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Plaintiff: Leodegario Salvador
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv00919
Filed: April 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that the parties shall submit a compliant proposed discovery plan and scheduling order no later than 5 p.m. on 1/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 1/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER STAYING CASE. This case is administratively STAYED. Once the proceedings in the United States Supreme Court in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank and Saticoy Bay LLC Series 350 Durango 104 v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage have concluded, any party may move to lift the stay. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER that both parties having appeared in this action and answered the complaint and counterclaim, the 13 Clerk's Entry of Default is vacated. Plaintiff Leodegario Salvador's 17 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default is Denied. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the parties shall file a Stipulated Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order by 1/13/2017 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salvador v. Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leodegario Salvador
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?