Greentree Financial Group, Inc.,v. World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc.
Plaintiff: Greentree Financial Group, Inc.
Defendant: World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc. and Clearwave Telecommunications, Inc.
Interested Party: Sheldon Drobny
Case Number: 2:2016cv00972
Filed: April 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER adopting #27 Report and Recommendation; This action is dismissed without prejudice for failure to effectuate service and/or prosecute. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 27, 2017 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT to #28 Objection to Report and Recommendation ; by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. (Austin, Gina)
September 15, 2017 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Objection to #27 Report and Recommendation by Interested Party Sheldon Drobny. (JM)
September 8, 2017 Filing 28 OBJECTION to #27 Report and Recommendation by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. Response to Objections to R&R due by 9/22/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Gina Austin in support of Objections)(Austin, Gina)
August 25, 2017 Filing 27 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Recommending #1 Complaint be dismissed. Objections to R&R due by 9/8/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Why Case Should Not be Dismissed. Show Cause Response due by 8/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #23 Motion for Default Judgment. Renewed Motion due by 8/7/2017. Any such motion must be served on Sheldon Drobny, at the address listed in Docket No. 24. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 12, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #23 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Sheldon Drobny. Replies due by 7/19/2017. (JM)
July 7, 2017 Filing 23 RENEWED MOTION for Default Judgment; filed by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Gina M Austin, #2 Proposed Order Judgment)(Austin, Gina)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #21 Motion for Default Judgment; Any renewed motion for entry of default judgment must be filed no later than July 6, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 8, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gina M. Austin ISO Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, #2 Judgment)(Leetham, Tamara)
August 17, 2016 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greentree Financial Group, Inc. re #13 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Leetham, Tamara)
August 17, 2016 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc. re #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (JM)
August 12, 2016 Filing 18 EXHIBIT(s) to #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default ; filed by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. (Leetham, Tamara)
August 10, 2016 Filing 17 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. ERROR: Default form not submitted. CORRECTION: Attorney Tamara Leetham advised to download and complete "Default" form, from the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, and file the Default Form as an exhibit and link to #16 Motion. Also, Attorney Tamara Leetham is in violation of Local Rule LR IC 5-1(b) re #16 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. The signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. Attorney advised in the future to file documents in accordance with Local Rules governing Electronic Case Filing. (no image attached)(DKJ)
August 10, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion for Clerk's Default, #2 Notice of Motion for Clerk's Default)(Leetham, Tamara)
July 27, 2016 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Process Server)(Leetham, Tamara)
July 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying #12 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 28, 2016 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc. (JM)
June 27, 2016 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default, #2 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default, #3 Proof of Service)(Austin, Gina)
June 1, 2016 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of SERVICE SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greentree Financial Group, Inc. re #1 Complaint. Greentree Financial Group, Inc. World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc. served on 5/16/2016, answer due 6/6/2016. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Austin, Gina) Modified to add correct party served on 6/1/2016 (DKJ). Modified on 6/28/2016 to reflect correct event (DKJ).
May 16, 2016 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Greentree Financial Group, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Robert Chris Cottone, Other Affiliate Michael Bongiovanni, Other Affiliate Weixuan Luo for Greentree Financial Group, Inc. added. . (Austin, Gina)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Certificate of Interested Parties. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a Certificate of Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1, no later than 4:00 p.m., May 16, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Gina Austin and approving Designation of Local Counsel, Patrick E. Ogle. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/5/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 4, 2016 Filing 7 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #5 Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Ogle, Patrick)
May 3, 2016 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 5/3/2016, deferring ruling on #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Petitioner has failed to complete Section 8 of the Verified Petition.Petitioner shall have until 5/10/2016 to correct the deficiencies by filing the CORRECTED Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event.Failure to timely remedy the deficiencies WILL result in the denial of the Verified Petition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EJD)
May 2, 2016 Filing 5 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gina M. Austin and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Patrick E. Ogle (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4101064) filed by Plaintiff Greentree Financial Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Ogle, Patrick) Corrected image #7 attached on 5/4/2016 (DKJ).
May 2, 2016 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 5/2/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
April 29, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel Gina M. Austin to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 6/13/2016. (no image attached) (PS)
April 29, 2016 Filing 2 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (PS)
April 29, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Greentree Financial Group, Inc., a Florida corporation against World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc. (FKA Clearwave Telecommunications, Inc.), a Colorado corporation, World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc., a Nevada corporation; and Does 1 through 10, inclusive (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4099923), filed by Greentree Financial Group, Inc., a Florida corporation. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/9/2016. Proof of service due by 7/28/2016. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ogle, Patrick)
April 29, 2016 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (PS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greentree Financial Group, Inc.,v. World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: World Nation Live Entertainment, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clearwave Telecommunications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greentree Financial Group, Inc.
Represented By: Gina M. Austin
Represented By: Patrick E Ogle
Represented By: Tamara Leetham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Sheldon Drobny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?