Winland v. Harbor freight Tools USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Joyce Winland
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Unknown: Gregory Bean
Case Number: 2:2016cv00987
Filed: May 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Stipulation; Disclosures due 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting 33 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; granting 34 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 7 days from entry of this Order. Third Party Complaint deadline: 7 days from entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 5/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint identical to that attached to 21 the motion to amend within seven (7) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion to Substitute Party and denying without prejudice request for leave to amend Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winland v. Harbor freight Tools USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Freight Tools USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven B Abbott
Represented By: Darrell D. Dennis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gregory Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Winland
Represented By: Jennifer Gastelum
Represented By: Scott Poisson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?