Amsel v. Eliades et al
Plaintiff: Jonah Amsel
Defendant: Aristotelis Eliades, Dolores Eliades and Douglas D. Gerrard
Case Number: 2:2016cv00999
Filed: May 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Referring Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER DENYING Defendant Aristotelis Eliades' 143 Motion for Summary Judgment.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Douglas D. Gerrard's 151 Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Claims of Jonah Amsel and Julio Rivera is GRANTED. Gerr ard is entitled to quasi-judicial immunity. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Gerrard on the two remaining claims.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Douglas D. Gerrard's 152 Motion for Summary J udgment Regarding Claims of Eduardo Maltman is GRANTED. Gerrard is entitled to quasi-judicial immunity. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant Gerrard on the two remaining claims.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pl aintiffs' 153 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on Liability Against All Defendants and on Defendant Gerrard's Tenth and Eleventh Affirmative Defenses is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Court GRANTS the motion in part, finding A ristotelis Eliades and Dolores Eliades were Jonah Amsel, Julio Rivera, and Eduardo Maltman's employers under the FLSA. The Court DENIES the motion in regards to Douglas Gerrard's affirmative defenses.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff s' 185 Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 37 is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' 186 Motion in Limine is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining parties submit a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order no later than October 15, 2018. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/30/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER Granting 149 Stipulation for Extension of Time (Second Request) re 143 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs' Responses due by 10/10/2017. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Denying Defendant Douglas Gerrard's 89 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 04/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER re 62 Motion to Stay Discovery, or in the alternative, Motion to Extend Case Deadlines. ORDERED that the following discovery plan and scheduling order dates shall apply: Discovery due by 2/3/2017. Motions due by 3/6/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/7/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation re 35 MOTION to Dismiss or Alternatively, Motion for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/25/2016. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Seal Exhibits A and B re 35 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall file a redacted version of exhibits A and B in the open record in compliance with Rule 5.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/5/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Amended ORDER Consolidating Cases. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motions to Consolidate are GRANTED. Case nos. 2:16-cv-00999-RFB-GWF, 2:16-cv-01005-JAD-GWF, and 2:16-cv-01007-JAD-GWF are consolidated, with case no. 2:16-cv-00999-RFB-GWF serving as th e lead case. All further filings in these cases shall be filed in the lead case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that case nos. 2:16-cv-01005-JAD-GWF and 2:16-cv-01007- JAD-GWF are reassigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearings in these cases scheduled before Judge Dorsey on July 11, 2016, are VACATED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amsel v. Eliades et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Amsel
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aristotelis Eliades
Represented By: Alexander G LeVeque
Represented By: Mark A. Solomon
Represented By: Jeremy M. Welland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolores Eliades
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Douglas D. Gerrard
Represented By: Nathan R Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?