Bank of America, N.A. v. Madeira Canyon Homeowners Association, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association
Defendant: Madeira Canyon Homeowners Association, Nevada Association Services, Inc. and SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv01053
Filed: May 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting 85 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) for Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC File a Reply to 84 Response to 78 Motion for 56(d) Relief. Replies due by 8/23/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 80 Motion for Leave to File Document Re: 78 Motion for 56(d) Relief. Responses due by 8/15/2022. Replies due by 8/22/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 8/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 44 Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC's Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 44) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is therefore instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC. T he remaining claims in this matter are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 36 Plaintiffs Bank of America, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 4 the l is pendens filed in this case is expunged. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 19 the cash deposit made by Bank of America is returned with interest to the Legal Owner named in the certificate of cash deposit. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING CASE. IT IS ORDERED that this case is administratively STAYED. Once the Ninth Circuit issues the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, case number 15-15233 (2:13-cv-649-PMP-NJK), any party may move to lift the st ay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are DENIED without prejudice to their refiling within 20 days after the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 8/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 6 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Pursuant to NRS 18.130(1) and the request for cost bond filed by SFR as 6 , BANA shall deposit with the Clerk of the Court a cost bond in the amount of $500 within 14 days of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 7/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Madeira Canyon Homeowners Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Melanie D Morgan
Represented By: Allison R. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeira Canyon Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Association Services, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher V. Yergensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Represented By: Diana Cline Ebron
Represented By: Howard C. Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?