Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada et al v. Tile Concepts, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Crafttsworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund, Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund and Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
Defendant: Tile Concepts, Inc. and Michael R. Trimble
Case Number: 2:2016cv01067
Filed: May 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of Plaintiffs against Tile Concepts, Inc., Michael R. Trimble. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 18 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause. Defendants shall appear before the District Judge at a time to be determined to show cause why civil contempt sanctions, including but not limited to, requiring Defendants to pay Plaintiffs&# 039; reasonable attorney's fees and costs in pursuing contempt, should not be imposed. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants by 5/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Order to Show Cause. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this order upon Defendants by 3/29/2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall show cause, in writing, no later than 4/12/2017, wh y sanctions should not be imposed for failure to comply with this Court's order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is set for hearing on 4/19/ 2017 at 9:30 A.M. in Courtroom 3A. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Adopting 13 Report and Recommendation and granting 9 Motion for Default Judgment. Defendants shall submit to an audit conducted by an independent third party of Plaintiffs' choosing within 14 days of the date of the Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada et al v. Tile Concepts, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Nevada
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Crafttsworkers Local 13 Health Benefits Fund
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Defined Contribution Pension Trust For Southern Nevada
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Allied Craftworkers Local 13 Vacation Fund
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Health Fund
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the Bricklayers & Trowel Trades International Pension Fund
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trustees of the International Masonry Institute
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tile Concepts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Trimble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?