Weinstein v. Meritor, Inc.
Plaintiff: M Paul Weinstein
Defendant: Meritor, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01076
Filed: May 13, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER denying 65 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 83 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER overruling 124 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER denying 127 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER denying 129 Motion to Strike; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Re: 81 , 84 , 92 Motions for Leave to File Document, 87 Motion to Seal. Motion Hearing set for 9/6/2019 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER Granting 79 Stipulation to Withdraw 71 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER granting 77 Stipulation; Re: 71 Motion to Compel. Responses due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 64 First Stipulation Re: 65 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 7/16/2019. Replies due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 57 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY and PROTECTIVE ORDER re 55 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 44 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 41 Amended Complaint. Meritor, Inc. answer due 2/16/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 41 Second Amended Complaint. Meritor, Inc. answer due 1/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that 23 Defendant Meritor's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Weinstein has until October 30, 2017 to file an amended complaint if he can cure the defects identified in this order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that 22 Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that a status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., October 23, 2017, in courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER that 18 Motion to Compel is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Motion to Extend Time re 23 Motion to Dismiss and 22 Motion to Stay Discovery: Responses due by 3/3/2017. Replies for 18 Motion to Compel due by 3/3/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Denying without prejudice 24 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 23 Motion to Dismiss and 22 Motion to Stay, and Reply re 18 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/7/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that 16 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically is GRANTED with the provisions enumerated in this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 15 Amended Motion to File Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Plaintiff must file the proposed amended complaint attached at ECF No. 15 as pages 423 by January 16, 2017. When filing, plaintiff must change the title of the document to "F irst Amended Complaint". FURTHER ORDERED that 10 Motion for Judgment and 11 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to that motion are DENIED as moot and without prejudice to the filing of a motion to dismiss the amended complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that 13 Countermotion for Leave to File Supplemental Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinstein v. Meritor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritor, Inc.
Represented By: Booker T Evans, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M Paul Weinstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?