Backman et al v. Goggin et al
Plaintiff: Irving A Backman, G&B Energy, Inc and Irving A. Backman & Associates, LLC
Defendant: C2 Engineering Services, Inc. and Christopher M Goggin
Counter Defendant: Irving A Backman, G&B Energy, Inc and Irving A. Backman & Associates, LLC
Counter Claimant: C2 Engineering Services, Inc. and Christopher M Goggin
Case Number: 2:2016cv01108
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER Granting 145 Stipulation to Extend Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Granting 147 Motion to Continue Re: 145 Stipulation. Motion Hearing reset for 10/30/2018 at 09:45 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 129 Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall immediately file a redacted copy of the motion for summary judgment on the public docket. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Granting 116 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The court will construe the motion as a Notice of Appearance on behalf of defendant Goggin, and Elliot S. Blut shall be recognized as counsel of record for Mr. Goggin in all further proceedings in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 109 Motion to Extend Time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have until 4/26/17, in which to file a stipulation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Goggin shall have until 4/26/17, in which to retain substitute counsel who shall make an appearance in accordance with the requirements of the Local Rules of Practice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 99 the Motion to Withdraw is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Christopher M. Goggin shall have until 3/17/17, in which to retain substitute counsel who shall make an appearance in accordance with the req uirements of the Local Rules of Practice, or shall file a notice with the court that he will be appearing in this matter pro se. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant C2 Engineering Services, Inc. shall have until 3/17/17, in which to retain sub stitute counsel who shall make an appearance in accordance with the requirements of the Local Rules of Practice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve the Defendants with a copy of this order at the individuals last known address, and the address for the corporation's agent for service of process: Christopher M. Goggin 518 Jani Place Boulder City, NV 89005, and C2 Engineering Services, Inc. c/o Christine A. Goggin 4415 Northchase Parkway NE Wilmington, NC 28405. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting 58 Stipulated Confidentiality and Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Denying 29 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/31/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting 32 Stipulation Extending Time re 26 Answer to Counterclaim. Irving A Backman answer due 7/18/2016; G&B Energy, Inc answer due 7/18/2016; Irving A. Backman & Associates, LLC answer due 7/18/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) (Main Document 47 replaced on 7/21/2016) (ADR).
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying ECF No. 7 Motion for TRO; and denying ECF No. 8 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Backman et al v. Goggin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Irving A Backman
Represented By: Michael Fee
Represented By: Dennis M. Lindgren
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Represented By: Joseph P Schrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: G&B Energy, Inc
Represented By: Michael Fee
Represented By: Dennis M. Lindgren
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Represented By: Joseph P Schrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Irving A. Backman & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Michael Fee
Represented By: Dennis M. Lindgren
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Represented By: Joseph P Schrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving A Backman
Represented By: Michael Fee
Represented By: Dennis M. Lindgren
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Represented By: Joseph P Schrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&B Energy, Inc
Represented By: Michael Fee
Represented By: Dennis M. Lindgren
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Represented By: Joseph P Schrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Irving A. Backman & Associates, LLC
Represented By: Michael Fee
Represented By: Dennis M. Lindgren
Represented By: Craig A. Newby
Represented By: Joseph P Schrage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: C2 Engineering Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rosalie Bordelove
Represented By: Leah A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Christopher M Goggin
Represented By: Rosalie Bordelove
Represented By: Leah A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C2 Engineering Services, Inc.
Represented By: Rosalie Bordelove
Represented By: Leah A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher M Goggin
Represented By: Rosalie Bordelove
Represented By: Leah A. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?