Jiles v. Warden Williams et al
Plaintiff: Maurice Jiles
Defendant: Nunez, Southern Desert Correction Center and Williams
Case Number: 2:2016cv01118
Filed: May 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Stipulation with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay is extended until Wednesday, 7/19/2017. On or before that date, Defendants shall file an updated status report or a stipulation of dismissal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/19/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the stay is extended through Friday, 6/16/17. Defendants shall file their status report on or before Friday, 6/16/17. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before Friday, 4/14/17, the Attor ney Generals Office shall either file a limited notice of appearance on behalf of Defendant Nunez for the purpose of settlement or file a notice informing the Court about the status of Defendant Nunez's identity. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Kat Howe - ADR)
January 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jiles v. Warden Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Jiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Desert Correction Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?