Agha-Kahn v. Pacific Community Mortgage Inc et al
Plaintiff: Salma Agha-Kahn
Defendant: Ronald Alonzo, American Securities Company of Nevada, Aurora Loan Services, Christopher J. Flaharty and Nichole R Flaharty, Fidelity National Title, Christopher J Flaharty, Nichole R Flaharty, Flaharty Family Trust, William Go, Gold Reverse Inc, Bobby Irias/Irlas, Steven Joe, Kurt Kingsolver, Trisha McMullin, Juliann McNeill, Michael McNeill, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc,, Noble Title, Pacific Community Mortgage Inc, Prudential Americana Group, Quality Loan Service Corp., Mary Jane Sarne, Theodore Schultz, Service-Irvine, Servicelink, Bee Vang, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo Financial National Bank
Case Number: 2:2016cv01124
Filed: May 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting 172 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/23/2018.; Flaharty Family Trust (a trust including subject property), Christopher J Flaharty (an individual) and Nichole R Flaharty (an individual) terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 153 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 98 Motion to Disqualify. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall file a Certificate of Interested Parties, which fully complies with LR 7.1-1, no later than 4:00 p.m. on October 21, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting 87 Motion to Set Aside 83 Clerk's Entry of Default as to Trisha McMullin. The Clerk of Court shall set aside the Default of Defendant Trisha McMullin. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 96 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Denying 53 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER that 77 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER that 62 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 1 Complaint is GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant Wells Fargo Financial National Bank to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is EXTENDED to August 12, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting ECF No. 30 Motion to Stay Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER. The Court INSTRUCTS the Clerk's Office to update Plaintiff's address to the correct address, and to resend the orders at 19 and 29 to Plaintiff at the updated address. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agha-Kahn v. Pacific Community Mortgage Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salma Agha-Kahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Alonzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Securities Company of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aurora Loan Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J. Flaharty and Nichole R Flaharty
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity National Title
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher J Flaharty
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichole R Flaharty
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flaharty Family Trust
Represented By: Todd W Prall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gold Reverse Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Irias/Irlas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Joe
Represented By: Ogonna M Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Kingsolver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisha McMullin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juliann McNeill
Represented By: Ogonna M Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael McNeill
Represented By: Ogonna M Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noble Title
Represented By: Aaron D. Lovaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Community Mortgage Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Americana Group
Represented By: Darren J Welsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Jane Sarne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Theodore Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service-Irvine
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Servicelink
Represented By: Marni Rubin Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bee Vang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?