Errico, et al. v State Bar of Nevada, et al.,
Plaintiff: William Errico and William Errico & Associates, P.C.
Defendant: David A. Clark and State Bar of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2016cv01159
Filed: May 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Defendants' 62 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. The claim against the State Bar of Nevada is Dismissed with prejudice. The 1983 and RICO claims against Clark are Dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 66 Motion to Extend Discovery without prejudice. The parties are further ordered to file a joint status report regarding discovery, including a discussion of the current deadlines in the case. That joint status report shall be filed by February 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 02/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Granting Defendants' 60 Motion to Extend Time. David A. Clark and State Bar of Nevada's response to Plaintiffs' 55 Amended Complaint due 1/9/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Granting 49 Emergency Motion to Extend Time to File Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 12/15/2016. In the future, Plaintiffs must comply with all applicable rules when seeking relief from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 40 Motion to Extend Time re Amended Complaint. Amended Complaint deadline: 11/17/2016. Motion Hearing re 39 Emergency Motion to Withdraw as Counsel set for 11/3/2016 04:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistr ate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. No later than 10/20/2016 Plaintiffs' current counsel of record shall serve Plaintiffs with this order and shall file a proof of service. Any response to 39 Emergency Motion due by 10/25/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD).
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying without prejudice Defendants' 30 Motion for Protective Order and 32 Motion to Stay. To the extent necessary the motions may be renewed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re 30 Motion for Protective Order re a deposition currently set for 9/27/2016. That deposition is vacated and stayed, pending resolution of the underlying motion for protective order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting 18 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 16 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and 17 MOTION to Amend. Defendants' Responses due by 8/22/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Errico, et al. v State Bar of Nevada, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David A. Clark
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Bar of Nevada
Represented By: Sheri M. Thome
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Errico
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Errico & Associates, P.C.
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?