Meridian OHC Partners, LP v. Cyanotech Corporation et al
Plaintiff: |
Meridian OHC Partners, LP |
Defendant: |
Cyanotech Corporation, Michael A Davis and Rudolf Steiner Foundation, Inc. |
Case Number: |
2:2016cv01161 |
Filed: |
May 24, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer A. Dorsey |
Presiding Judge: |
Carl W. Hoffman |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 25, 2018 |
Filing
123
ORDER granting 122 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Case terminated. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 20, 2018 |
Filing
121
ORDER granting 120 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List; Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/20/2018. Attorney Hannah Goodwin terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 3, 2018 |
Filing
114
ORDER granting 113 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re: 75 Third Amended Complaint. Michael A Davis answer due 5/15/2018; Rudolf Steiner Foundation, Inc. answer due 5/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 15, 2018 |
Filing
106
ORDER denying 78 and 79 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
November 21, 2017 |
Filing
105
ORDER approving ECF No. 104 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of the Pending Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 11/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
June 21, 2017 |
Filing
92
ORDER Granting 90 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Anna erickson White and Robert W. May are substituted in place and stead of Timothy P. Crudo and Lyndsey M. Marcelino for Michael A. Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing
55
ORDER Granting 54 Stipulation to Extend Time to respond to 50 , 52 and 53 Motions to Dismiss. Plaintiff's responses due by 12/9/2016. Defendants replies due by 12/22/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/14/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
September 27, 2016 |
Filing
42
ORDER that the defendants' motions to dismiss (ECF Nos. 25 , 27 , 32 ) are DENIED as moot and without prejudice to the filing of new motions that directly address the claims in the Verified First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 9/27/2016 to correct signature date (DKJ).
|
August 24, 2016 |
Filing
22
ORDER Granting 17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Alex L. Fugazzi and V. R. Bohman, and Timothy Crudo and Lyndsey M. Marcelino in place and stead of Alan Sparer and Jin H. Kim for Michael A Davis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?