The Bank Of New York Mellon v. Southern Highlands Community Association, et al
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC and Southern Highlands Community Association
Case Number: 2:2016cv01177
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting 73 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 74 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER granting 75 Motion for Summary Judgment; Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER denying 45 Motion for Protective Order; denying 54 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that, no later than August 24, 2017, the parties shall meet and confer and file a joint status report with the Court as to what extent the disputed deposition requests from their motion for protective order (ECF No. 45 ) and motion to compel (ECF No. 54 ) are still relevant in light of the dismissed claims, and the denial of certiorari in Bourne. FURTHER ORDERED that 56 Defendant's Motion to Stay is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion to Dismiss.; denying 51 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 34 Motion for Service by Publication.; granting 35 Motion to Enlarge Time to Serve Summons. FURTHER ORDERED that the summons in this action must be served by publication in a newspaper, published in the state of Nevada, for a period of four weeks and at least once a week during that time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline to effect service of process is extended up to and including 5/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Certify a question of Law to Nevada's Supreme Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 12/8/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 9 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff shall post security in the amount of $500.00 within 7 days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Bank Of New York Mellon v. Southern Highlands Community Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFR Investments Pool 1, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Highlands Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Natalie L Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?