Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Mohave Restoration, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust, Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust, Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust and Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Vacation Trust
Defendant: Jeremiah L. Cox and Mohave Restoration, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01190
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 57 Stipulation of Dismissal. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement of the parties. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Extend Joint Pretrial Order Deadline (Eighth Request). Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 5/1/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Stipulation to Withdraw 42 Third-Party Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Notice of Settlement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must file dismissal documents or a joint status report by 4/23/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 42 Motion for Summary Judgment (Third Request). Responses due by 3/9/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 42 Motion for Summary Judgment (Second Request). Responses due by 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline to respond to 42 the motion for summary judgment is extended to 2/12/2018. But counsel is cautioned that workload will not likely be considered to be good cause for a second extension of time. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER. Based on 34 the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Hanover Insurance Company are DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own fees and costs. This dismissal does not terminate Hanover as a party, because Hanover continues to prosecute third-party claims. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust et al v. Mohave Restoration, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of Southern Nevada Laborers Local 872 Training Trust
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Joint Pension Trust
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of Trustees of the Construction Industry and Laborers Vacation Trust
Represented By: Seth T Floyd
Represented By: Michael A Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremiah L. Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohave Restoration, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?