Bank of America v. Pueblo at Sante Fe Condominium Association, Inc., at al.
Plaintiff: Bank of America
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC, Keynote Properties, LLC and Pueblo at Sante Fe Condominium Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01199
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER to Release Bond re 31 CERTIFICATE of Cash Deposit. The court will refund the $500.00 deposit plus interest to Akerman LLP. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/7/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; cc: Finance - SLD)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Granting Plaintiff 's 60 Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 49 Motion to Stay Case is Denied as moot. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: 60 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 1/5/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 52 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 9/11/2018. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 38 Stipulation for Extension of Time (First Request) re 36 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/7/2017. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that this case is administratively STAYED pending exhaustion of all appeals of Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank, 832 F.3d 1154 (9th Cir. 2016). All pending motions are DENIED without prejudice with leave to refile within 21 day s after the stay is lifted. Beginning on 5/1/2017 the parties must file a joint status report updating the Court on the status of this case every 180 days. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Defendant Keynote Properties, LLC's 14 Motion for Demand for Security of Costs. Plaintiff must submit a bond pursuant to this Order in the amount of $500.00 as to Defendant. Failure to do so within thirty days of the filing date of this Order shall constitute grounds for dismissal. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America v. Pueblo at Sante Fe Condominium Association, Inc., at al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keynote Properties, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pueblo at Sante Fe Condominium Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America
Represented By: William Shane Habdas
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?