Davis v. Koontz
Plaintiff: Davis and Raymond Davis
Defendant: Koontz and Dean Koontz
Case Number: 2:2016cv01207
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 23, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2017 Filing 24 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Dean Koontz against Raymond Davis. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice for Lack of Jurisdiction.; denying #13 Motion to Strike.; Case terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant, Dean Koontz. Jeffry Scott Riesenmy withdrawn from the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 2, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Jeff Riesenmy by Defendant Dean Koontz. (Gallagher, Kristen)
August 2, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kristen T. Gallagher on behalf of Defendant Dean Koontz. (Gallagher, Kristen)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting Defendant's #15 Motion to Stay Discovery. The pending #16 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is Denied without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 1, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE Non-Opposition re: #15 MOTION to Stay; filed by Raymond Davis. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Kerr, Preston)
August 1, 2016 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, on 8/1/2016. Pending before the Court is a motion to stay discovery. Docket No. 15. Any response shall be filed by August 4, 2016, and any reply shall be filed by August 8, 2016. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
July 29, 2016 Filing 16 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Raymond Davis . (Kerr, Preston)
July 28, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendant Dean Koontz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Silvestri, Jeffrey)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the pro se plaintiff or plaintiff's attorney shall submit a proposed discovery plan/scheduling order pursuant to LR 26-1. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/29/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
July 18, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #12 Response to Motion, #11 Response to Motion (EMERGENCY) by Defendant Dean Koontz. Responses due by 8/4/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeff Silvestri)(Silvestri, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2016 Filing 12 RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Change Venue, filed by Plaintiff Raymond Davis. Replies due by 7/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kerr, Preston)
July 13, 2016 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, filed by Plaintiff Raymond Davis. Replies due by 7/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Kerr, Preston)
July 7, 2016 Filing 10 STATUS REPORT by Defendant Dean Koontz. (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2016 Filing 9 STATEMENT RE: REMOVAL filed by Defendant Dean Koontz. (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2016 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Dean Koontz. Responses due by 6/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dean Koontz)(Silvestri, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2016 Filing 7 MOTION to Change Venue by Defendant Dean Koontz. Responses due by 6/23/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dean Koontz)(Silvestri, Jeffrey)
June 6, 2016 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 6/6/2016. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Chief Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
June 2, 2016 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Dean Koontz. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
June 2, 2016 Filing 4 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE re #1 Petition for Removal, by Raymond Davis on 6/1/2016; executed by Dean Koontz. (Silvestri, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that Defendant shall file a certificate of interested parties no later than 6/3/16. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
May 31, 2016 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 5/31/2016. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/18/2016. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
May 31, 2016 Case assigned to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (PS)
May 31, 2016 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL to Federal Court from Eighth Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-16-734495-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-4140306), filed by Dean Koontz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Silvestri, Jeffrey) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Koontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Davis
Represented By: Preston S Kerr
Represented By: Taylor Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Koontz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Koontz
Represented By: Jeffry Scott Riesenmy
Represented By: Jeffrey A Silvestri
Represented By: Kristen T. Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?