Middleton v. Parrish Snead Franklin Simpson, PLC et al
Plaintiff: Ervin Middleton
Defendant: England Run Community Association, Inc., Christian B Franklin, Melinda J LeBeau, Jennifer Lee Parrish, Parrish Snead Franklin Simpson, PLC, Paul A Simpson and George P. Snead
Case Number: 2:2016cv01217
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re 45 Notice. No further action to be taken on filing. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 38 , 41 Middleton's motions are DENIED. The clerk of court is instructed to accept no further filings from Middleton in this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 5 Motion to Dismiss.; granting 7 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.; granting 8 Motion to Dismiss.; denying 26 Motion for Declaratory Judgment.; If Middleton wishes to pursue these claims in this case and can c ure the defects identified in this order, he may file an amended complaint within 21 days of entry of this order. Otherwise, this case will be closed. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the action be, and hereby is, DISMISSED without prejudice only as to defendant George P. Snead. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall file a stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order not later than August 12, 2016 in compliance with the provisions of LR 26-1 of the Rules of Practice of the United States District Court for the District of Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 07/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Parrish Snead Franklin Simpson, PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: England Run Community Association, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica A Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian B Franklin
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda J LeBeau
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Lee Parrish
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parrish Snead Franklin Simpson, PLC
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul A Simpson
Represented By: Peter M. Angulo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George P. Snead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?