Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Defendant: 8101 Flamingo 1032 Trust, Alessi & Koenig, LLC and Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01218
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Nationstar Mortgage LLC's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 64 is GRANTED and 8101 Flamingo 1032 Trust's Motion for Summary judgment 65 is DENIED. Nationstar is entitled to summary judgment on its qui et-title claim based on a tender theory. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Nationstar Mortgage LLC, DECLARING that 8101 Flamingo 1032 Trust purchased the property at 8101 W. Flamingo Road, #1032, Las Vegas, Nevada 89147 subject to the deed of trust dated January 10, 2006, and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/24/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Lift Stay of Discovery; 8101 Flamingo 1032 Trust and Alessi & Koenig, LLC answer due 5/13/2019. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Alessi & Koenig, LLC shall have until 9/14/18 to advise the Court if it will retain new local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ERROR: Filed in wrong case by Clerk's Office. Document terminated. (EDS) ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 50 the Court's Order is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Alessi & Koenig, LLC shall have until 9/3/18 to advise the Court if it will retain new local counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Margaret E Schmidt terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/17/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation to Extend Time re 24 MOTION to Partially Lift Stay. ( Replies due by 3/10/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply re 24 MOTION to Partially Lift Stay.( Replies due by 2/8/2017.) Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/9/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER STAYING CASE Pending Issuance of Mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank . Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Alessi and Koenig's 10 Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations Pursuant to Local Rule 7-3(b) is Denied and the 12 Motion for Order Granting Non-Monetary Status Pursuant to NRS 107/SB 239 is Denied without prejudice to its refiling in a format that complies with the local rules of this court. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 08/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC v. Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 8101 Flamingo 1032 Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alessi & Koenig, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Copper Sands Homeowners Association, Inc.
Represented By: George M. Ranalli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Represented By: Tenesa S Scaturro
Represented By: Ariel E. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?