Centex Homes v. Everest National Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Centex Homes
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company, Financial Pacific Insurance Company, Hartford Casualty Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company and Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv01275
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Granting 74 Stipulation of Dismissal of Lexington Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER Granting 71 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice against Defendant Interstate First & Casualty Company. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice re Everest National Insurance Company. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 19 the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 50 Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Points and Authorities is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file its amended complaint fourteen days following the issuance of this Order. See Order for details. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/29/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 OMNIBUS TRANSFER ORDER. ORDERED that each of these cases shall be TRANFERRED to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, who were assigned the earliest opened case, for all further proceedings: 2:16-cv-01275-GMN-PAL Centex H omes v. Everest Natl Ins. Co., et al.; 2:16-cv-01634-APG-GWF Centex Homes v. Navigators Specialty Ins. Co., et al.; 2:16-cv-01958-JAD-VCF Centex Homes v. Zurich Am. Ins. Co., et al. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, and Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties must each file a brief by 7/3/2017, not to exceed ten pages, discussing whether the exclusions are relevant to 19 Defendant's Motion with regard to Plaintiff's breach of contract claim. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 31 Stipulation re 19 First MOTION to Dismiss re 1 Complaint. ( Replies due by 11/28/2016.) Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Stipulation RE: Briefing on Lexington Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Lexington Insurance Company shall filethe relevant insurance policies by 11/7/2016. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
October 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER.Dismissing Centex Homes' Complaint against Hartford Casualty Insurance Company Without Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on 10/13/2016 to add text - (DL).
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Stipulation To Extend Time To File A responsive Pleading to Initial Complaint (First Request) Answer due 10/10/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centex Homes v. Everest National Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centex Homes
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Represented By: Scott S Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everest National Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Pacific Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?