Centex Homes v. Zurich Specialties London Limited et al
Plaintiff: Centex Homes
Defendant: Assurance Company of America, Northern Insurance Company Of New York, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Unionamerica Insurance Company Limited and Zurich Specialties London Limited
Case Number: 2:2016cv01278
Filed: June 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that the clerk shall close this case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Counsel for the parties shall file a joint pretrial order which fully complies with the requirements of LR 16-3 and LR 16-4 no later than 3/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting 39 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/6/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice as to Zurich Specialties London Limited. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centex Homes v. Zurich Specialties London Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern Insurance Company Of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unionamerica Insurance Company Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich Specialties London Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centex Homes
Represented By: Sarah J. Odia
Represented By: Scott S Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?