Harris v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Brandon Kale Harris
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Brian E Williams
Case Number: 2:2016cv01305
Filed: June 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 22 respondents' Motion to Dismiss First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Harris is DENIED a certificate of appealability. The Clerk of Court is ordered to ENTER JUDGMENT accordingly and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/27/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 17 petitioner's Motion to Withdraw Counsel is DENIED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Extend Time to respond to 12 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents' answer due 7/25/2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the schedule for further proceedings set forth in the order 7 entered July 13, 2016, will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition due by 2/24/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition for writ of habeas corpus deadline: 12/26/2016. In all other respects, the schedule for further proceedings set forth in order 7 entered 7/13/16 will remain in effect. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
July 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Scheduling ORDER. Amended Petition due by 10/12/2016.Attorney General of the State of Nevada answer due 12/12/2016; Brian E Williams answer due 12/12/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to separately file 1 -1 petition, add Adam Paul Laxalt, Attorney General for the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents, and electronically serve respondents with a copy of Harris's petition and a copy of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents will have 20 days from receipt of the petition to appear in this action. IT IS FURTHER ORDER ED that 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender for the District of Nevada (FPD) is appointed to represent Harris. The Clerk of Court is instructed to electronically serve the FPD with a copy of this order and a cop y of Harriss petition. The FPD must file a notice of appearance or indicate to the court its inability to represent Harris in this case by July 4, 2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/14/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Dennis C. Wilson
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Brian E Williams
Represented By: Dennis C. Wilson
Represented By: Adam P. Laxalt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Brandon Kale Harris
Represented By: Thomas Kenneth Lee
Represented By: Rene Valladares
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?