Middleton v. Omely Telecom Corp a/k/a Pro Tax and Accounting
Plaintiff: Ervin Middleton
Defendant: Omely Telecom Corp.
Case Number: 2:2016cv01369
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:2271 Federal Tort Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice under FRCP 4(m). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter Judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 36 Objection to Order Denying Writ and to Relief and Reconsideration. Plaintiff's 37 Motion for Recusal is Denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to issue Summons to Omely Telecom Corp. and deliver that S ummons and a copy of the 3 Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. After Middleton receives copies of thecompleted USM-285 form from the U.S. Marshal, he has 20 days to file a notice with the court identifying if Omely was served with the s ummons and original complaint.If Omely Telecom Corp. is not properly served with the original complaint and the new summons by 9/25/2018 this case will be dismissed under FRCP 4(m) without further prior notice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - US 285 form mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER that Plaintiff's 23 Writ of Error Quae Coram Nobis Residant which is construed as a Motion for Reconsideration is Denied and the 24 Request for Judicial Notice is Denied. The 30 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus is Denied and th e 32 Motion for Hearing on that Petition is Denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court must deliver to the U.S. Marshal for service the original 4 Summons and a copy of the 3 Complaint for service. 4m deadline extended to 12/29/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - 285 form mailed to Plaintiff; 3 , 4 and this Order hand delivered to USM - SLD)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Accepting and Adopting Magistrate Judge Foley's 29 Report and Recommendation. Sam Bateman's 28 Motion to Dismiss is Denied as moot. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that Sam Bateman's 28 Motion to Dismiss be Denied as moot. Objections to R&R due by 10/25/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/11/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting Reginald Beatty's 25 Motion to Strike Fugitive Document re 20 Summons Returned Executed. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that all parties other than Plaintiff Ervin Middleton and Defendant Omely Telecom Corp. shall be removed from the CM/ECF service list. This order is without prejudice to Plaintiff obtaining proper leave of court to file an amended complaint if he desires to do so. The Clerk of Court shall strike Plaintiff's 8 First Amended Complaint and the 9 , 10 , 13 , 14 , 15 , and 18 Summons. The Clerk of Court shall strike Plaintiff's 16 - 17 Erratas. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk shall file the complaint, issue summons to the Defendant named in the complaint, deliver the summons to the U.S. Marshal for service, and send the required USM-285 forms to Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/14/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Middleton v. Omely Telecom Corp a/k/a Pro Tax and Accounting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ervin Middleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omely Telecom Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?