Griffin v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Alvin J Griffin
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 2:2016cv01370
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 28:1442 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 32 the Report and Recommendation is accepted and adopted in full. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 14 Petitioner's Motion to Set Aside is DENIED, and 18 Respondent's Cross-Motion to Affirm is GRANTED.< br>IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 36 Petitioner's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 37 Petitioner's Motion for Relief from Judgment is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 41 Petitioner's Emergency Motion for Relief is DENIED as moot. The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Record and 25 Motion for Entry of Default is scheduled for 10:00 a.m., 1/30/17, in Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 1/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting 6 Unopposed Motion to Appear Telephonically at Hearing Set for August 29, 2016, 1:00 p.m. Ms. Sharon Lahey may appear telephonically. The call in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code:3912597. The call must be made 5 minu tes prior to the hearing time. The court will join the call and convene the proceedings. The call must be made on a land line. The use of a cell phone or speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 08/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 1 Petition for Removal. Status Conference set for 8/29/2016 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Alvin J. Griffin must attend the hearing in person Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL) Modified on 7/29/2016 to add text - (DL).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Griffin v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Sharon Lahey
Represented By: Mark E. Woolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alvin J Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?