Gardener v. City of Las Vegas
Plaintiff: Christopher Gardener
Defendant: City of Las Vegas, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department and Joseph Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2016cv01384
Filed: June 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 46 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting 47 Motion to Dismiss; Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Fifth Stipulation to Extend Discovery. Discovery due by 6/12/2018. Motions due by 7/12/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 12 the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. See Order for details. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 32 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend/Correct the Complaint is GRANTED. If Plaintiff elects to file a second amended complaint, Plaintiff shall have twenty-one days from the filing date of this Order to do so. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 7/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation of Dismissal as to Defendant City of Las Vegas without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gardener v. City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Gardener
Represented By: Kevin Rene Hansen
Represented By: Amy M. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?