Securities & Exchange Commission v. Hemp, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: Diversified Investments LLC, Barry K. Epling, Ferris Holding, Inc., Hemp, Inc., Hobbes Equities, Inc., Bruce Perlowin, Jed M. Perlowin and Quantum Economic Protocols LLC
Unknown: Antony M. Santos
Case Number: 2:2016cv01413
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting 61 MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order. ( Motions due by 11/13/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Granting 59 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Robert J. Cassity of Holland & Hart LLP is substituted in the place of Anthony M. Santos of A. M. Santos Law, Chtd. Defendants Hemp, Inc., Bruce J. Perlowin, Barry K. Epling, Ferris Holding, Inc., and Hobbes Equities, Inc., subject to the provisions of LR IA 11-6(c) and (d). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/15/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Amend 40 Scheduling Order. ( Motions due by 9/13/2017.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting 52 Stipulated/Consent Judgment as to Defendant Jed M. Perlowin. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 54 Stipulated/Consent Judgment as to Defendant Quantum Protocols LLC. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting 53 Stipulated/Consent Judgment as to Defendant Diversified Investments LLC. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/21/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Granting 46 Joint Stipulation for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting 42 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Answers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 36 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jonathan D Bletzacker for Defendants Diversified Investments LLC, Jed M. Perlowin, and Quantum Economic Protocols LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jacob L. Fonnesbeck. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 09/08/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting 35 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brent R. Baker for Defendants Diversified Investments LLC, Jed M. Perlowin, and Quantum Economic Protocols LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Jacob L. Fonnesbecj. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 09/08/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 18 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Timothy J. Coley for Barry K. Epling, Hemp, Inc., Bruce Perlowin and approving Designation of Local Counsel Antony M. Santos. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/6/16. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 13 Stipulation. Diversified Investments LLC answer due 9/6/2016; Jed M. Perlowin answer due 9/6/2016; Quantum Economic Protocols LLC answer due 9/6/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/1/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 23, 2016 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey, on 8/23/2016. RE: 17 and 18 Verified Petitions for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice do not comply with LR 1A 11-2(a). Counsel failed to use the form furnished by the Clerk of Court in accordance with LR 1A 11-2(a). Counsel is advised to download and complete "Verified Petition" form, in accordance with the Court's website - www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx and refile with the court under event "Notice of Corrected Image" and link to originally filed petitions 17 and 18 , respectively. Additionally, local counsel is instructed to execute Petitions. Counsel has until September 6, 2016 to remedy the deficiencies. Failure to comply will result in denial of Petitions. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Hemp, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Investments LLC
Represented By: Brent R Baker
Represented By: Jonathan Dale Bletzacker
Represented By: Jacob L. Fonnesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry K. Epling
Represented By: Robert J Cassity
Represented By: Timothy J Coley
Represented By: Thomas Sporkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferris Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Cassity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hemp, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Cassity
Represented By: Timothy J Coley
Represented By: Thomas Sporkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hobbes Equities, Inc.
Represented By: Robert J Cassity
Represented By: Antony M. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Perlowin
Represented By: Robert J Cassity
Represented By: Timothy J Coley
Represented By: Thomas Sporkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jed M. Perlowin
Represented By: Brent R Baker
Represented By: Jonathan Dale Bletzacker
Represented By: Jacob L. Fonnesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantum Economic Protocols LLC
Represented By: Brent R Baker
Represented By: Jonathan Dale Bletzacker
Represented By: Jacob L. Fonnesbeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Antony M. Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Amy J. Oliver
Represented By: James J. Thibodeau
Represented By: Daniel Wadley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?