Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Nevada Health Centers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Nevada Health Centers, Inc. and Ultracare Las Vegas
Case Number: 2:2016cv01495
Filed: June 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING 42 CONSENT JUDGMENT CONSENT DECREE. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting 40 Stipulation re Stay (Second Request). See Order for details/deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Equal Employment Opportunity Commission against Ultracare Las Vegas re 36 Stipulated/Consent Judgment filed by Equal Employment Opportunity Commission. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/20/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER that 15 Defendant's Motion for Exception to AttendanceRequirements is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 10/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation. Defendant Nevada Health Care Center shall forthwith separately file it's Amended Answer which it attached as Exhibit 1 to the stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting 7 Motion to Admit Government Attorney to Practice in the District of Nevada. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 08/05/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Nevada Health Centers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Nechole M Garcia
Represented By: Anna Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Health Centers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ultracare Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?